FL S0858 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a county from enforcing certain limits on the activity of a bona fide farm operation on agricultural land under certain circumstances. Prohibits a county from charging agricultural lands for stormwater management assessments and fees under certain circumstances. Allows an assessment to be collected if credits against the assessment are provided for implementation of best management practices. Creates the "Agricultural Land Acknowledgement Act," etc.
Title
Agriculture
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-20 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/25/11, 1:15 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 235 | |
2011-03-16 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/21/11, 10:15 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 67 | |
2011-03-07 | CS by Agriculture; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 -SJ 118 | |
2011-02-28 | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 03/07/11, 3:15 pm, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Agriculture; Community Affairs; Regulated Industries; Budget -SJ 67 | |
2011-02-08 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0707 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
H0803 () 2011-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1007 (Ch.
S0408 () 2011-05-05 - Amendment(s) to House amendment(s) failed (345548, 499748, 975732) -SJ 976, 1001
H0803 () 2011-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1007 (Ch.
S0408 () 2011-05-05 - Amendment(s) to House amendment(s) failed (345548, 499748, 975732) -SJ 976, 1001
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
163 | 3162 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3163 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 064 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
604 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
604 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
604 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 4095 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
823 | 145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |