FL S0858 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating a tuition and fee exemption for students who enter the custody of the Department of Children and Families after a specified age and who are reunited with their biological or legal custodians before reaching a specified age after spending at least 18 months in department custody; requiring the student to meet certain federal financial aid eligibility requirements; providing that the exemption includes fees associated with enrollment in applied academics for adult education instruction; providing that the exemption remains valid until the student reaches a specified age, etc.
Title
Fee Exemptions for Reunited Students
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-11-16 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2021-11-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7065 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Chapter No. 2022-67
S7034 (Similar To) 2022-04-12 - Chapter No. 2022-68
S7034 (Similar To) 2022-04-12 - Chapter No. 2022-68
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/858 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/858/BillText/Filed/HTML |