FL S0866 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-13 - Withdrawn from further consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-13 - Withdrawn from further consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that a lessor's interest in commercial property is not subject to a construction lien for construction, renovation, or improvement made by a lessee under certain conditions, etc.
Title
Construction Liens
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-13 | Senate | Withdrawn from further consideration |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Withdrawn from Judiciary; Regulated Industries; Rules |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Regulated Industries; Rules |
2015-11-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0389 (Same As) 2015-11-17 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/866 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0866/BillText/Filed/HTML |