FL S0872 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing proceeds of the tax to be used toward funding incentives for the production of films and television series by certain production companies, etc.
Title
Tourist Development Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2023-12-12 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1453 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Ways & Means Committee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/872 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/872/BillText/Filed/HTML |