FL S0892 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Chapter No. 2023-222
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Chapter No. 2023-222
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying that individuals entitled to receive the federal minimum wage under the Federal Fair Labor Standards Act, as amended, are eligible to receive the state minimum wage, etc.
Title
State Minimum Wage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#373 (Y: 86 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#31 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#31 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-16 | Chapter No. 2023-222 | |
2023-06-12 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-06-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed; YEAS 86, NAYS 30 |
2023-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-01 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2023-05-01 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2023-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-28 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-04-28 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/1/2023) |
2023-04-28 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2023-04-27 | House | In Messages |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/23 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 14 NAYS 5 |
2023-04-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/19/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 3 |
2023-03-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/22/23, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 8 NAYS 2 |
2023-02-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/06/23, 3:30 pm, 401 Senate Building |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H917 (Same As) 2023-05-01 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 892 (Ch. 2023-222)