FL S0896 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Introduced on December 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-23 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00792; Amendment(s) adopted (244252, 193452) -SJ 00792; Substituted CS/CS/HB 747 -SJ 00792; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 747 (Ch. 2010-57) -SJ 00792
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-23 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00792; Amendment(s) adopted (244252, 193452) -SJ 00792; Substituted CS/CS/HB 747 -SJ 00792; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 747 (Ch. 2010-57) -SJ 00792
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revises the membership of the Diabetes Advisory Council. Prohibits school districts from restricting the assignment of diabetic students to certain schools for certain reasons. Authorizes a student to manage diabetes while at school, at school-sponsored activities, or in transit to or from school or school-sponsored activities with written authorization from the parent and physician. Requires the State Board of Education to adopt rules, etc.
Title
Treatment of Diabetes [SPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Victor Crist [R] | Sen. Nancy Detert [R] | Rep. Mike Fasano [R] | Sen. Dennis Jones [R] |
Sen. Alfred Lawson [D] | Sen. Durell Peaden [R] | Sen. Eleanor Sobel [D] | Sen. Ronda Storms [R] |
Sen. Frederica Wilson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-23 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00792; Amendment(s) adopted (244252, 193452) -SJ 00792; Substituted CS/CS/HB 747 -SJ 00792; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 747 (Ch. 2010-57) -SJ 00792 | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00651 | |
2010-04-20 | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-04-19 | CS/CS by- Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00651; CS read 1st time on 04/20/10 -SJ 00653 | |
2010-04-14 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations, 04/19/10, 10:30 am, 412-K | |
2010-04-01 | Now in Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations -SJ 00350 | |
2010-03-26 | CS by Health Regulation; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00350; CS read 1st time on 03/30/10 -SJ 00353; Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-03-23 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 03/26/10, 8:00 am, 412-K | |
2010-03-22 | Now in Health Regulation -SJ 00269 | |
2010-03-17 | Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Education Pre-K - 12 (353002); YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 00269; Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments) | |
2010-03-12 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 03/17/10, 8:00 am, 301-S | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Health Regulation; Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations -SJ 00065 | |
2010-01-14 | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Health Regulation; Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations | |
2009-12-10 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0747 (Similar To) 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-57
H0593 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 747 (Ch. 2010-57), CS/HB 889 (Ch. 2010-34), HB 5311 (Ch. 2010-161)
S1954 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Regulation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 747 (Ch. 2010-57), CS/HB 889 (Ch. 2010-34), HB 5311 (Ch. 2010-161)
H0593 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Care Regulation Policy (HFPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 747 (Ch. 2010-57), CS/HB 889 (Ch. 2010-34), HB 5311 (Ch. 2010-161)
S1954 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Health Regulation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 747 (Ch. 2010-57), CS/HB 889 (Ch. 2010-34), HB 5311 (Ch. 2010-161)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0385 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |