FL S0896 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Postponing the scheduled repeal of a provision requiring the Agency for Health Care Administration to contract with dental plans for dental services on a prepaid or fixed-sum basis; authorizing the agency to provide a prepaid dental health program in Miami-Dade County on a permanent basis, etc.
Title
Prepaid Dental Plans
Sponsors
Sen. Anitere Flores [R] | Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Health Policy Committee | Sen. Rene Garcia [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) |
2013-04-25 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-04-23 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/23/13, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/17/13, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations; Rules |
2013-03-18 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-03-14 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/14/13, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0793 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died on Calendar