FL S0896 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the board of county commissioners to grant a license to work on or operate specified communications services within the right-of-way limits of certain county or public highways or roads; authorizing the Department of Transportation and certain local governmental entities to prescribe and enforce rules or regulations regarding placing and maintaining specified structures within the right-of-way limits of roads or publicly owned rail corridors under their respective jurisdictions; prohibiting a municipality or county from requiring a utility to provide proprietary maps of facilities under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Location of Utilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2015-04-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/23/15, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered |
2015-04-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/21/15, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered |
2015-04-07 | Senate | CS/CS by Transportation read 1st time |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-04-02 | Senate | CS/CS by Transportation; YEAS 5 NAYS 1 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 04/02/15, 11:30 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Now in Transportation |
2015-03-24 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-03-23 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 1 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/23/15, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Transportation; Appropriations |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0391 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
125 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
337 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
337 | 403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |