FL S0896 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Chapter No. 2017-76
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Chapter No. 2017-76
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the financial disclosures required to be filed by certain Florida Prepaid College Board members; extending the repeal date of the direct-support organization for the Florida Prepaid College Board, etc.
Title
Florida Prepaid College Board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#418 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#13 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#13 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | Chapter No. 2017-76 | |
2017-06-09 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-06-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2017-05-03 | House | CS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2017-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-02 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-05-02 | House | Substituted for HB 845 |
2017-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-01 | House | Received |
2017-05-01 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/17 |
2017-05-01 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2017-04-27 | House | In Messages |
2017-04-27 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-25 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/17 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-04-20 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/20/17, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2017-04-14 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education, 04/13/17, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education |
2017-03-23 | Senate | CS by Education read 1st time |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-03-21 | Senate | CS by Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 03/21/17, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education; Appropriations |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0845 (Same As) 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 896 (Ch. 2017-76)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1009 | 971 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 983 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |