FL S0908 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing credits against oil and gas production taxes and sales taxes payable by direct pay permitholders, respectively, under the Strong Families Tax Credit; revising the calculation of the corporate income tax credit for the Florida alternative minimum tax; creating the Strong Families Tax Credit; specifying requirements for the Department of Children and Families in designating eligible charitable organizations; providing credits against excise taxes on certain alcoholic beverages and the insurance premium tax, respectively, under the Strong Families Tax Credit, etc.
Title
Strong Families Tax Credit
Sponsors
Senate Finance and Tax Committee | Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs Committee | Sen. Ray Rodrigues [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Finance and Tax (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31) |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2021-04-01 | Senate | CS/CS by Finance and Tax read 1st time |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | CS/CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 03/31/21, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2021-03-25 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-23 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 3 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/23/21, 12:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H897 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Ways & Means Committee; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
H7061 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Chapter No. 2021-31
S7068 (Similar To) 2021-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
H7061 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Chapter No. 2021-31
S7068 (Similar To) 2021-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7061 (Ch. 2021-31)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
211 | 0252 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 1833 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 186 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 1876 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 1212 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 51056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |