FL S0922 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Chapter No. 2016-174, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 589 (Ch. 2016-130)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Chapter No. 2016-174, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 589 (Ch. 2016-130)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the funding of a waste tire abatement program from the Solid Waste Management Trust Fund up to a specified percentage of total funds; authorizing the Department of Environmental Protection to use account funds to contract with a third party for the closing and long-term care of solid waste management facilities under specified circumstances; authorizing waste tire abatement programs under the small county consolidated grant program, etc.
Title
Solid Waste Management
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#815 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#19 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#19 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Chapter No. 2016-174, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 589 (Ch. 2016-130) | |
2016-04-01 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-03-18 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2016-03-08 | House | CS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-07 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-07 | House | Substituted for CS/HB 987 |
2016-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-04 | House | Received |
2016-03-04 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/16 |
2016-03-04 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2016-03-02 | House | In Messages |
2016-03-02 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-22 | Senate | CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/24/16 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-02-18 | Senate | CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/18/16, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 02/11/16, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Favorable by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 01/20/16, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2015-11-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0987 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 922 (Ch. 2016-174), CS/CS/CS/HB 589 (Ch. 2016-130)
S1052 (Similar To) 2016-03-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 589 (Ch. 2016-130), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62), CS/SB 922 (Ch. 2016-174)
H0589 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Chapter No. 2016-130, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62), CS/SB 922 (Ch. 2016-174)
S1052 (Similar To) 2016-03-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 589 (Ch. 2016-130), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62), CS/SB 922 (Ch. 2016-174)
H0589 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Chapter No. 2016-130, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62), CS/SB 922 (Ch. 2016-174)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
403 | 413 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 7032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 709 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 7095 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |