FL S0922 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Mary Chadwick Act"; revising provisions prohibiting the recreational discharge of a firearm outdoors; providing criminal penalties; providing an exception; prohibiting the propelling of any potentially lethal projectile over or across private land while target shooting, etc.
Title
Discharging Firearms in Public or on Residential Property
Sponsors
Sen. Lori Berman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H709 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
790 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
810 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/922 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/922/BillText/Filed/HTML |