FL S0922 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the program within the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services; requiring the department to select grant recipients based on specified criteria; providing that a recipient may not receive more than one award per year under the program; specifying that grant funding is contingent upon specific annual appropriation by the Legislature, etc.
Title
Florida Young Farmer and Rancher Matching Grant Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#18 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Messages |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-03-01 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/22 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/24/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 01/26/22, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Favorable by Agriculture; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 01/13/22, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2021-11-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H597 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee