FL S0928 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exemption from public records requirements for certain information held by the Department of Health, the Board of Medicine, or the Board of Osteopathic Medicine, pursuant to the Interstate Medical Licensure Compact; providing an exemption from public meeting requirements for certain meetings or portions of certain meetings of the Interstate Medical Licensure Compact Commission; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemptions; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records and Meetings/Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/10/20, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2020-01-29 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/28/20, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S926 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H1269 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
H1269 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee