FL S0952 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to the State Constitution, relating to state trust funds, to require a two-thirds vote of the membership of each house of the Legislature in a separate bill for that purpose only to expend the balance of a state trust fund, or any portion of a state trust fund, for any purpose other than a purpose authorized by the act that created the trust fund.
Title
State Trust Funds [WPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Finance and Tax | |
2010-03-11 | Now in Finance and Tax -SJ 00188 | |
2010-03-10 | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 3 -SJ 00188 | |
2010-03-05 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/10/10, 1:00 pm, 110-S | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Finance and Tax; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules -SJ 00068 | |
2010-01-14 | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Finance and Tax; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules | |
2009-12-15 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0389 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development