FL S0952 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 4039 -SJ 875
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 4039 -SJ 875
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing provisions relating to recreation centers, use and acquisition of land, and equipment and maintenance; supervision; playground and recreation boards; cooperation with other units and boards; gifts, grants, devises, and bequests; issuance of bonds; petition for referendum; resolution or ordinance providing for recreation system; tax levy; payment of expenses and custody of funds; and duties and functions of the Division of Recreation and Parks of the Department of Environmental Protection, etc.
Title
Recreation and Parks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | Laid on Table, refer to HB 4039 -SJ 875 | |
2012-03-06 | Read 3rd time -SJ 874 | |
2012-03-05 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-03-05 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-03-02 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/12 | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/12 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 671 | |
2012-02-21 | Favorable by- Budget; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 -SJ 671 | |
2012-02-16 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 02/21/12, 3:45 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-02-01 | Now in Budget -SJ 325 | |
2012-02-01 | Favorable by Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 325 | |
2012-01-27 | On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations, 02/01/12, 10:15 am, 401 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-25 | Now in Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations | |
2012-01-25 | Now in Budget -SJ 279 | |
2012-01-24 | Favorable by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 279 | |
2012-01-19 | On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 01/24/12, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 80 | |
2011-12-06 | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Budget -SJ 80 | |
2011-11-15 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
418 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
418 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
418 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
418 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
418 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
418 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
418 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
418 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
418 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
418 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
418 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
418 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/952 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0952/BillText/Filed/HTML |