FL S0974 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing a municipality or a county operating under a home rule charter to file a request with the Public Service Commission for a hearing for a determination of prudence on environmental damage caused by a public utility; requiring that pending hearings regarding recovery for remediation of such environmental damage be stayed until after the commission makes such determination or until the request is dismissed; prohibiting the utility from recovering expenditures to remedy the damage upon a finding that the utility did not act prudently, etc.
Title
Public Utility Environmental Remediation Costs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Community Affairs; Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Rules |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/974 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0974/BillText/Filed/HTML |