FL S0982 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a specified appropriation for certain projects related to the Indian River Lagoon system; requiring the distribution to be reduced by an amount equal to the debt service paid on certain bonds, etc.
Title
Land Acquisition Trust Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources |
2017-03-23 | Senate | CS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation read 1st time |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-03-22 | Senate | CS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 03/22/17, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0234 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Messages
H0847 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
H1033 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
H0847 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
H1033 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee