FL S1004 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the amount of a certain exemption related to disabled ex-servicemembers, etc.
Title
Tax Exemptions for Disabled Ex-servicemembers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Finance and Tax (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Favorable by Finance and Tax; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 02/08/24, 10:45 am, 37 Senate Building |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/16/24, 11:00 am, 401 Senate Building |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2023-12-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H727 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in State Affairs Committee
S7074 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7073
S7074 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7073