FL S1008 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing credit for the sale of tobacco products to be extended to a retail dealer under specified conditions; providing for the suspension of the sale of tobacco products to retail dealers delinquent in their credit payments; providing procedures for challenging such suspension; providing notice requirements; providing an exception to such suspension for retail dealers purchasing tobacco products with cash, etc.
Title
Tobacco Products
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Hays [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Regulated Industries | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 83 | |
2011-12-06 | Referred to Regulated Industries; Budget -SJ 83 | |
2011-11-17 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1008 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1008/BillText/Filed/HTML |