FL S1008 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for a financial assistance program administered by the Justice Administrative Commission and the Office of the Attorney General to assist a career assistant state attorney, assistant public defender, assistant attorney general, or assistant statewide prosecutor in the repayment of eligible student loans; requiring the administering body to make a payment of a certain amount based on the length of employment as an eligible career attorney; requiring the Justice Administrative Commission and the Office of the Attorney General to develop procedures to administer the program, etc.
Title
Student Loans
Sponsors
Sen. Jeremy Ring [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Education |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Education; Judiciary; Appropriations |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0931 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1008 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1008/BillText/Filed/HTML |