FL S1008 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 609 (Ch. 2014-52)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 609 (Ch. 2014-52)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Article V Constitutional Convention Act"; establishing qualifications of delegates and alternate delegates to an Article V constitutional convention; providing for the appointment of delegates by the Legislature; requiring majority vote approval in each chamber for the appointment of delegates; authorizing the Legislature to recall a delegate and fill a vacancy; authorizing the presiding officers of the Legislature to call a special legislative session to fill a vacancy; establishing a legislative method for appointments and recalls, etc.
Title
Article V Constitutional Conventions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 609 (Ch. 2014-52) |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 609 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-22 | Senate | CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/14 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 6 NAYS 5 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/21/14, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-04-10 | Senate | CS by Appropriations; YEAS 11 NAYS 6 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/10/14, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 3 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/08/14, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations; Rules |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0609 (Similar To) 2014-06-02 - Chapter No. 2014-52
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 93 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 931 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 932 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 933 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 9331 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 9332 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 9333 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 9334 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 9335 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 9336 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 9337 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 934 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 9341 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 9342 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 9343 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 9344 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 9345 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 935 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 9351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 9352 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |