FL S1008 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that manual physical restraint be used only in an emergency when there is an imminent risk of serious injury or death to a student or others; prohibiting the use of manual physical restraint by school personnel who are not certified to use district-approved methods for applying restraint techniques; prohibiting school personnel from placing a student in seclusion; requiring that parents be notified of a school district's policies regarding the use of manual physical restraint, etc.
Title
Seclusion and Restraint on Students with Disabilities in Public Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Education Pre-K - 12 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Rules |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1008 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1008/BillText/Filed/HTML |