FL S1046 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Chapter No. 2022-107
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Chapter No. 2022-107
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Defining the term "law enforcement geolocation information"; providing an exemption from public records requirements for law enforcement geolocation information held by a law enforcement agency; requiring law enforcement agencies to disclose law enforcement geolocation information under specified circumstances; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/Law Enforcement Geolocation Information
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#774 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#27 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#27 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Chapter No. 2022-107 | |
2022-05-12 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-05-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2022-03-07 | House | CS passed; YEAS 112, NAYS 0 |
2022-03-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-04 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-03-04 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-03-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-04 | House | Substituted for CS/CS/CS/HB 773 |
2022-03-01 | House | 1st Reading (Engrossed 1) |
2022-03-01 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/4/2022) |
2022-03-01 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-02-23 | House | In Messages |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2022-02-23 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 1 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (366794) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/22 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/15/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-03 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/02/22, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/25/22, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2021-11-24 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H773 (Same As) 2022-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 1046