FL S1054 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a law enforcement officer, under certain circumstances, to arrest and keep in custody for a specified period a person who is suspected of domestic violence. Requires a law enforcement officer, under certain circumstances, to arrest and to keep in custody for a specified period a suspected primary aggressor in a case of domestic violence, etc.
Title
Injunctions for Protection Against Violence
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 79 | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Budget -SJ 79 | |
2011-02-14 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
741 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
741 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
741 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
784 | 046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1054 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1054/BillText/Filed/HTML |