FL S1058 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defines the terms "agency" and "member of the individual's immediate family." Conforms a cross-reference. Revises the requirements for eligibility to receive benefits. Prohibits a determination of ineligibility based solely on the fact that the individual is available only for part-time work. Revises the definition of the term "good cause." Prohibits a determination of ineligibility based solely on the fact that the individual is available only for part-time work. Conforms cross-references.
Title
Unemployment Compensation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 79 | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Budget -SJ 79 | |
2011-02-14 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0728 () 2011-05-03 - Read 2nd time -SJ 758
S1552 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S1552 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
443 | 036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 1216 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1058 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1058/BillText/Filed/HTML |