FL S1080 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that specified eligibility requirements do not apply to students in certain grades beginning in a specified school year; revising student eligibility criteria; providing for the calculation of the scholarship amount for students diagnosed with a disability by certain physicians or psychologists; providing for the adjustment of the scholarship amount under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
John M. McKay Scholarships for Students with Disabilities Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Education |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; Appropriations |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H829 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1080 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1080/BillText/Filed/HTML |