FL S1080 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing Medicaid managed care specialty plans to serve certain children who receive guardianship assistance payments under the Guardianship Assistance Program, etc.
Title
Medicaid Managed Care Specialty Plans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2022-01-19 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-01-19 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/19/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H607 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
S1950 (Similar To) 2022-04-08 - Chapter No. 2022-42
H7047 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1950
S1950 (Similar To) 2022-04-08 - Chapter No. 2022-42
H7047 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1950