FL S1090 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Chapter No. 2024-77
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Chapter No. 2024-77
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the punishment for the unlawful sale of alcoholic beverages; revising the activities that may be declared a public nuisance under local administrative actions to abate certain activities to include persons who commit the unlicensed or unlawful sale of alcoholic beverages more than a specified number of times within a specified period, etc.
Title
Unauthorized Sale of Alcoholic Beverages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#921 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#27 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Regulated Industries (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#27 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Regulated Industries (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-12 | Chapter No. 2024-77 | |
2024-04-11 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-02 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2024-03-06 | House | CS passed; YEAS 114, NAYS 0 |
2024-03-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-05 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-03-05 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-04 | House | 1st Reading (Engrossed 1) |
2024-03-04 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/5/2024) |
2024-03-04 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2024-02-28 | House | In Messages |
2024-02-28 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (663346) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/24 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | CS by Rules read 1st time |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | CS by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/14/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/06/24, 11:30 am, 37 Senate Building |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Now in Criminal Justice |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Favorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/29/24, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Building |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2023-12-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1123 (Similar To) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
562 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 138 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |