FL S1100 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring school report cards to include school and school district return-on-investment ratings; requiring the Commissioner of Education to establish a statewide education return-on-investment rating to evaluate the extent to which schools and school districts are using financial resources to improve student achievement; creating the Schoolhouse Funding Pilot Program within the Department of Education; requiring a school district to provide student performance data to a pilot school in the same manner as it provides that data to other public schools, etc.
Title
Education Fiscal Accountability
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Education |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0875 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1003 | 621 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 64 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 69 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1100 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1100/BillText/Filed/HTML |