FL S1114 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a membership association that receives a specified percentage of its budget from public funds to file an annual report with the Legislature; prohibiting a membership association from expending public funds on litigation against the state, etc.
Title
Membership Associations that Receive Public Funds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died on Calendar |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 12 NAYS 6 |
2015-04-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/09/15, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2015-03-18 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-03-17 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 3 NAYS 2 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/17/15, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Appropriations |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0549 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Community Affairs