FL S1120 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 875 (Ch. 2016-60)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 875 (Ch. 2016-60)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising and providing definitions, etc.
Title
Motor Vehicle Service Agreement Companies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-24 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 875 (Ch. 2016-60) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 875 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/24/16 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/17/16, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/08/16, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Now in Commerce and Tourism |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2016-01-26 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/26/16, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2015-12-14 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0875 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Chapter No. 2016-60