FL S1130 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the eligibility requirements for taking examinations required to practice dentistry; authorizing applicants enrolled in a recognized dental specialty program on a specified date to take the examinations if specified conditions are met; providing for future expiration of such authorization, etc.
Title
Examination of Dentists
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-18 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2013-03-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 03/19/13, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-03-14 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/14/13, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0463 (Same As) 2013-05-03 - Died in Health Policy