FL S1130 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the Florida Young Farmer and Rancher Matching Grant Program within the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services; requiring the department to select grant recipients based on specified criteria; requiring the department to give preference to veterans, etc.
Title
Young Farmers and Ranchers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/25/20, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Favorable by Agriculture; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 01/14/20, 2:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2019-12-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H191 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1130 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1130/BillText/Filed/HTML |