FL S1132 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 485 (Ch. 2021-163)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 485 (Ch. 2021-163)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing nursing home facilities to employ personal care attendants if they are participating in a certain training program developed by the Agency for Health Care Administration, in consultation with the Board of Nursing; providing limitations on such personal care attendants' practice; requiring the agency to authorize the continuation of certain personal care attendant programs under certain circumstances; authorizing certain persons to be employed by a nursing home facility as personal care attendants for a specified period if a certain training requirement is met, etc.
Title
Personal Care Attendants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 485 (Ch. 2021-163) |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 485 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/22/21 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-20 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-04-19 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 2 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/19/21, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/23/21, 12:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2021-03-18 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-17 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 1 |
2021-03-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/17/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H485 (Same As) 2021-06-28 - Chapter No. 2021-163
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
400 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 211 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |