FL S1136 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Health, in coordination with the Board of Pharmacy, to establish and administer the At-home Drug Deactivation and Disposal System Program for a specified purpose; providing requirements for the at-home drug deactivation and disposal systems; requiring the department, in coordination with the board, to develop relevant educational materials and a plan for distribution of the at-home drug deactivation and disposal systems and educational materials, etc.
Title
At-home Drug Deactivation and Disposal Systems
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H843 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1136 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1136/BillText/Filed/HTML |