FL S1144 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing provisions relating to local business taxes, etc.
Title
Local Business Taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2024-01-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H609 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
125 | 01047 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 04465 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
202 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 023 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 0315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 042 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 043 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 044 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 0532 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 0535 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 0536 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 0537 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 054 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 063 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 064 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 066 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 067 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 162 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 191 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 192 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 193 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 194 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 196 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 1965 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 1967 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 1969 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 1971 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 1973 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
205 | 1975 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
213 | 0535 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
213 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
213 | 756 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
290 | 0057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
330 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
337 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
376 | 84 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
379 | 3761 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
482 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
482 | 242 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 127 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 128 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 532 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 537 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
500 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
500 | 511 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 016 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 160 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
507 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
539 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 904 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 928 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 9281 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 935 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 939 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 955 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
616 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1144 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1144/BillText/Filed/HTML |