FL S1148 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7051 (Ch. 2021-241)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7051 (Ch. 2021-241)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a law enforcement officer to intervene when another officer is using or attempting to use excessive force under certain circumstances; requiring a law enforcement officer to render aid to a victim of excessive force under certain circumstances; requiring a law enforcement officer to report the commission of a criminal offense by another officer while on duty, etc.
Title
Excessive Use of Force by Law Enforcement Officers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7051 (Ch. 2021-241) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1451 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
S1982 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7051 (Ch. 2021-241)
H1573 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7051 (Ch. 2021-241)
H7051 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-241
S1982 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7051 (Ch. 2021-241)
H1573 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7051 (Ch. 2021-241)
H7051 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-241
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1148 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1148/BillText/Filed/HTML |