FL S1162 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Higher Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Higher Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the formation of family charter academies as part of the state's public school system; providing guiding principles and purposes for family charter academies; providing that certain entities may submit an application to a school district or a Florida College System institution to open a family charter academy; requiring that a family charter academy applicant negotiate and enter into a contract for funding with the school district or Florida College System institution; providing requirements for applications; authorizing a district school board or a Florida College System institution to sponsor a family charter academy; providing duties of sponsors, etc.
Title
Family Charter Academies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Higher Education | |
2012-02-21 | Now in Higher Education -SJ 523 | |
2012-02-21 | Favorable by Education Pre-K - 12; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 523 | |
2012-02-16 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 02/21/12, 9:15 am, 301 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 94 | |
2012-01-10 | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Higher Education; Budget -SJ 94 | |
2011-12-06 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1162 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1162/BillText/Filed/HTML |