FL S1162 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Truth in Government Act"; requiring that persons addressing a legislative committee take an oath or affirmation of truthfulness; requiring that a member of the legislative committee administer the oath or affirmation; providing criminal penalties for certain false statements before a legislative committee; authorizing the use of a signed appearance form in lieu of an oral oath or affirmation, etc.
Title
Legislature
Sponsors
Sen. Janet Cruz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2019-12-06 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 143 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 1435 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1162 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1162/BillText/Filed/HTML |