FL S1170 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as "Jaime's Law"; requiring background checks for the sale or transfer of ammunition; providing exceptions, etc.
Title
Sales of Ammunition
Sponsors
Sen. Lauren Book [D] | Sen. Tina Polsky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1172 (Related) 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
H25 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
H27 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
H25 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
H27 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1170 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1170/BillText/Filed/HTML |