FL S1170 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removing powers of the Florida Housing Finance Corporation to develop and administer the State Apartment Incentive Loan Program; renaming the State Housing Initiatives Partnership Program as the State Housing Initiatives Partnership Block Grant Program; removing municipalities from eligibility under the program; providing that the corporation shall distribute moneys appropriated by the Legislature for the program, rather than distribute moneys in the Local Government Housing Trust Fund; revising eligible counties and distribution calculations under the State Housing Initiatives Partnership Block Grant Program, etc.
Title
State Housing Assistance Programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Appropriations; Rules |
2021-12-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1553 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
193 | 018 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 183 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 0081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 5061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 507 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 5087 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 5088 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 5095 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 511 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 517 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 531 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 628 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 9071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 9072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 9073 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 9075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 9076 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 9089 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 5105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1170 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1170/BillText/Filed/HTML |