FL S1178 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting an applicant or licensee from establishing or implementing additional criteria for measuring the sales or service performance of franchised motor vehicle dealers; authorizing a dealer that contends that an assigned performance requirement, sales goal, or sales objective violates certain prohibited activities of licensees to maintain certain injunctive and administrative actions; requiring the applicant or licensee to have the burden of proving by a preponderance of the evidence that the criteria for measuring the performance, goal, or objective comply with a provision that prohibits certain activities of licensees, etc.
Title
Franchised Motor Vehicle Dealers
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Gruters [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Infrastructure and Security |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 03/12/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H773 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1178 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1178/BillText/Filed/HTML |