FL S1178 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the deposing of an individual who, at the time of the request for the deposition, is 17 years of age or younger and has been a victim of human trafficking or specified sexual offenses; requiring a court to issue a protective order for the victim if the court approves a deposition of the victim; authorizing a victim to have counsel and a victim advocate present at the deposition; prohibiting certain self-represented defendants from directly deposing a victim, etc.
Title
Deposing Victims of Certain Offenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1281 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
H523 (Similar To) 2021-04-22 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1826 (Ch. 2021-189)
H523 (Similar To) 2021-04-22 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1826 (Ch. 2021-189)
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1178 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1178/BillText/Filed/HTML |