FL S1200 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the Patient Compensation System; providing a process for filing applications for compensation under the system; requiring individuals with relevant clinical expertise to determine whether the facts stated in the application, prima facie, rise to a claim for medical injury; providing for review of awards by an administrative law judge, etc.
Title
Compensation for Personal Injury or Wrongful Death Arising from a Medical Injury
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Rules |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1198 (Related) 2015-05-01 - Died in Judiciary
H1109 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Judiciary Committee
H1111 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Judiciary Committee
H1109 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Judiciary Committee
H1111 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
456 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 404 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 406 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 407 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 408 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 409 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 411 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1200 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1200/BillText/Filed/HTML |