FL S1210 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 447 (Ch. 2016-225)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 447 (Ch. 2016-225)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing land authorities to acquire real and personal property or any interest therein to reduce impacts on hurricane evacuation clearance times and to contribute funds to the Department of Environmental Protection for the acquisition of lands by the department, etc.
Title
Land Authorities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 447 (Ch. 2016-225) |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Fiscal Policy |
2015-12-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0867 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 447 (Ch. 2016-225)
H0447 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Chapter No. 2016-225
S0770 (Similar To) 2016-03-09 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 447 (Ch. 2016-225)
H0447 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Chapter No. 2016-225
S0770 (Similar To) 2016-03-09 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 447 (Ch. 2016-225)
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1210 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1210/BillText/Filed/HTML |