FL S1210 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 983 (Ch. 2019-139)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 983 (Ch. 2019-139)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Ratifying a specified rule relating to implementation of expanded workers' compensation benefits for first responders for the sole and exclusive purpose of satisfying any condition on effectiveness pursuant to s. 120.541(3), F.S., which requires ratification of any rule meeting any specified thresholds for likely adverse impact or increase in regulatory costs, etc.
Title
Ratification of Rules of the Department of Financial Services
Sponsors
Sen. Lauren Book [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 983 (Ch. 2019-139) |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Substituted HB 983 |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/19 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/23/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/25/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Rules |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H983 (Same As) 2019-06-26 - Chapter No. 2019-139
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1210 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1210/BillText/Filed/HTML |