FL S1210 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-02 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 909
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-02 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 909
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that the Secretary of Environmental Protection has exclusive jurisdiction in setting standards or procedures for evaluating environmental conditions and assessing potential liability for the presence of contaminants on certain agricultural lands; prohibiting the secretary from delegating such authority to a local governmental entity, etc.
Title
Pollution Control Standards and Liability
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Agriculture (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Environment and Natural Resources (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Agriculture (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Environment and Natural Resources (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 909 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 909 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/22 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Favorable by Agriculture; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 02/10/22, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Now in Agriculture |
2022-02-09 | Senate | CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 02/07/22, 2:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Agriculture; Appropriations |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H909 (Same As) 2022-05-19 - Chapter No. 2022-127