FL S1226 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revises the grounds under which the Department of Health or corresponding board is required to refuse to admit a candidate to an examination and refuse to issue or renew a license, certificate, or registration of a health care practitioner. Provides an exception. Requires a delinquent licensee whose license becomes delinquent before the final resolution of a case regarding Medicaid fraud to affirmatively apply by submitting a complete application for active or inactive status during the licensure cycle in which the case achieves final resolution, etc.
Title
Health Care Fraud
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#18 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-05-03 | In Messages | |
2011-05-03 | Read 2nd time -SJ 732 | |
2011-04-29 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/03/11 | |
2011-04-14 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 469 | |
2011-04-13 | Favorable by- Budget; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 -SJ 469 | |
2011-04-08 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/13/11, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-03-30 | Now in Budget -SJ 300 | |
2011-03-29 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-03-28 | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 300 | |
2011-03-23 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/28/11, 3:15 pm, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-15 | Now in Criminal Justice -SJ 226 | |
2011-03-14 | Favorable by Health Regulation; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -SJ 226 | |
2011-03-09 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 03/14/11, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 91 | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Health Regulation; Budget -SJ 91 | |
2011-02-18 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
456 | 036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 0635 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |