FL S1240 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing February 27, 2024, as "Dominican-American Heritage Day" in Florida, etc.
Title
Dominican-American Heritage Day
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan Avila [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | Senate | Adopted |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1138 (Similar To) 2024-01-02 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H8047 (Similar To) 2024-03-05 - Adopted by Publication
H8047 (Similar To) 2024-03-05 - Adopted by Publication
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1240 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/1240/BillText/Filed/HTML |